THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:07:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Baghdad College of Medicine, 1980
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 5100 Erin Mills Parkway
#E229A
Mississauga Ontario L5M 4Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 607-2600
Fax: 905 607 9292

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Dec 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 05 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jamal Alwan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 May 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Alwan (CPSO#: 117530 )
Business Address: 5235 Oscar Peterson Blvd
Mississauga ON L5M 0E1

Corporation Name: Jamal Alwan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 13 May 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Baghdad College of Medicine, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 5100 Erin Mills Parkway
#E229A
Mississauga Ontario L5M 4Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 607-2600
Fax: 905 607 9292

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Dec 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 05 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jamal Alwan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 May 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Alwan (CPSO#: 117530 )
Business Address: 5235 Oscar Peterson Blvd
Mississauga ON L5M 0E1

Corporation Name: Jamal Alwan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 13 May 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAMAL ALWAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALWAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAMAL ALWAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALWAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Baghdad College of Medicine, 1980

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Feb 2019
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Feb 2019