THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:46:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3-475 Bond St W
Oshawa ON L1J 2M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9054476528
Fax: 9052256528
Address: 300 Rossland Road East
102
Ajax Ontario L1Z 0K4
Phone: 9054476528
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 222 King Street East
Durham Cardiology
2200
Bowmanville Ontario L1C 1P6
Phone: 9054476528
Fax: 9052256528

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 18 Oct 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 18 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site
LOCATION: Ajax

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ayach Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Apr 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Ayach (CPSO#: 117582 )
Business Address: 3-475 Bond St W
Oshawa ON L1J 2M2

Corporation Name: Dr. B. Ayach Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Jul 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Ayach (CPSO#: 117582 )
Business Address: 117 King Street East
Oshawa Ontario L1H 1B9
(905) 723-8551
Business Address: 3-475 Bond Street West
Oshawa Ontario L1J 2M2
9054476528

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3-475 Bond St W
Oshawa ON L1J 2M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9054476528
Fax: 9052256528
Address: 300 Rossland Road East
102
Ajax Ontario L1Z 0K4
Phone: 9054476528
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 222 King Street East
Durham Cardiology
2200
Bowmanville Ontario L1C 1P6
Phone: 9054476528
Fax: 9052256528

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 18 Oct 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 18 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site
LOCATION: Ajax

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ayach Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Apr 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Ayach (CPSO#: 117582 )
Business Address: 3-475 Bond St W
Oshawa ON L1J 2M2

Corporation Name: Dr. B. Ayach Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Jul 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Ayach (CPSO#: 117582 )
Business Address: 117 King Street East
Oshawa Ontario L1H 1B9
(905) 723-8551
Business Address: 3-475 Bond Street West
Oshawa Ontario L1J 2M2
9054476528

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BILAL AYACH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AYACH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BILAL AYACH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AYACH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2019
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Mar 2019