THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:51:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. Matthew's University, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Yorkdale Medical Clinic
A103
11685 Yonge St
Richmond Hill Ontario L4E 0K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 770-9057
Fax: (905) 917-0215
Address: 237 Sackville Street
Toronto Ontario M5A 3G1
Phone: 0
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 237 Sackville Street
Toronto Ontario M5A 3G1
Phone: 416-703-1111
Fax: 437-524-7402

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Mar 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 04 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Illinois

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital Vaughan
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
LOCATION: Vaughan

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mena Megellie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Dec 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Megellie (CPSO#: 117600 )
Business Address: 237 Sackville Street
Toronto Ontario M5A 3G1
Business Address: Yorkdale Medical Clinic
A103-11685 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4E 0K7
(905) 770-9057
Business Address: Noolardi Medical Clinic
100-10083 Keele Street
Maple Ontario L6A 3Y8
(905) 832-4644

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: St. Matthew's University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Yorkdale Medical Clinic
A103
11685 Yonge St
Richmond Hill Ontario L4E 0K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 770-9057
Fax: (905) 917-0215
Address: 237 Sackville Street
Toronto Ontario M5A 3G1
Phone: 0
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 237 Sackville Street
Toronto Ontario M5A 3G1
Phone: 416-703-1111
Fax: 437-524-7402

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Mar 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 04 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Illinois

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital Vaughan
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
LOCATION: Vaughan

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mena Megellie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Dec 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Megellie (CPSO#: 117600 )
Business Address: 237 Sackville Street
Toronto Ontario M5A 3G1
Business Address: Yorkdale Medical Clinic
A103-11685 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4E 0K7
(905) 770-9057
Business Address: Noolardi Medical Clinic
100-10083 Keele Street
Maple Ontario L6A 3Y8
(905) 832-4644

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MENA WAHIB MEGELLIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEGELLIE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MENA WAHIB MEGELLIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEGELLIE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. Matthew's University, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Mar 2019
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Mar 2019