THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 04:05:05 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Birmingham, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Northpoint Family Medicine
2 Dewside Dr
Brampton Ontario L6R 3Y5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 792-0074
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Feb 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 11 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P. Aggarwal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Mar 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Aggarwal (CPSO#: 117672 )
Business Address: 2 Dewside Drive
Suite 101
Brampton Ontario L6R 3Y5
(905) 792-0074

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Birmingham, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Northpoint Family Medicine
2 Dewside Dr
Brampton Ontario L6R 3Y5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 792-0074
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Feb 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 11 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P. Aggarwal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Mar 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Aggarwal (CPSO#: 117672 )
Business Address: 2 Dewside Drive
Suite 101
Brampton Ontario L6R 3Y5
(905) 792-0074

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PUJA AGGARWAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AGGARWAL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PUJA AGGARWAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AGGARWAL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Birmingham, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Feb 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Feb 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 29 Mar 2019
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 18 Feb 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Feb 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Mar 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 29 Mar 2019