THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
21/05/25 04:05:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Maharashtra University of Health Scien, 2005
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Division of Radiology
50 Charlton Ave E
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 522-1155
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 01 Jul 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mandeep Ghuman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Oct 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ghuman (CPSO#: 117691 )
Business Address: 50 Charlton Ave E
Hamilton ON L8N 4A6

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: Maharashtra University of Health Scien, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Division of Radiology
50 Charlton Ave E
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 522-1155
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 01 Jul 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mandeep Ghuman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Oct 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ghuman (CPSO#: 117691 )
Business Address: 50 Charlton Ave E
Hamilton ON L8N 4A6

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
01 Mar 2023
30 Jun 2026
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Mar 01 2023
EXPIRY DATE: Jun 30 2026
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Mandeep Singh Ghuman may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
Medical Imaging, McMaster University, in which Dr. Ghuman holds an
academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
the date of issuance or when Dr. Ghuman no longer holds the academic
appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Ghuman's clinical
performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or
academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Ghuman's certificate
of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
report.

Note: This certificate is issued on July 1, 2020, and expires on June 30, 2026.
Upon renewal of Dr. Ghuman's academic appointment at McMaster University,
the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs
2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Mandeep Singh Ghuman may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
Medical Imaging, McMaster University, in which Dr. Ghuman holds an
academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
the date of issuance or when Dr. Ghuman no longer holds the academic
appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Ghuman's clinical
performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or
academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Ghuman's certificate
of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
report.

Note: This certificate is issued on July 1, 2020, and expires on June 30, 2026.
Upon renewal of Dr. Ghuman's academic appointment at McMaster University,
the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs
2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Maharashtra University of Health Scien, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2026
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 May 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2019
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2026

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 May 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Apr 2019