THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:16:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2018
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-206106 Hwy 26
Meaford ON N4L 1L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 2266621101
Fax: 2266621104

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brightshores Health System Owen Sound
HOSPITAL: Brightshores Health System
LOCATION: Owen Sound

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brandon T. Kingston Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Jul 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Kingston (CPSO#: 117712 )
Business Address: 1-206106 Hwy 26
Meaford ON N4L 1L9
9052527030

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-206106 Hwy 26
Meaford ON N4L 1L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 2266621101
Fax: 2266621104

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brightshores Health System Owen Sound
HOSPITAL: Brightshores Health System
LOCATION: Owen Sound

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brandon T. Kingston Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Jul 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Kingston (CPSO#: 117712 )
Business Address: 1-206106 Hwy 26
Meaford ON N4L 1L9
9052527030

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRANDON THOMAS KINGSTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KINGSTON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRANDON THOMAS KINGSTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KINGSTON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019