THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 06:15:52 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Academy of Medicine, Lublin, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Homewood Health Centre
150 Delhi St.
Guelph Ontario N1E 6K9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-824-1010
Extension: 2432
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 116-284 Queen St E
Brampton ON L6V 1C2
Phone: 905-455-6464
Fax: 1-866-265-9976
Address: Guelph General Hospital
Guelph Ontario N1E 4J4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 7600 Weston Rd
Woodbridge ON L4L 8B7
Phone: (289) 371-3500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 01 May 2019
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 01 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
Homewood Health Centre Guelph
HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

HOSPITAL: Homewood Health Centre
LOCATION: Guelph

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Chahal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Chahal (CPSO#: 117720 )
Business Address: 115 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 4J4
Business Address: Homewood Health Centre
150 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 4J4
Business Address: 148 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 4J4

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Academy of Medicine, Lublin, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Homewood Health Centre
150 Delhi St.
Guelph Ontario N1E 6K9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-824-1010
Extension: 2432
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 116-284 Queen St E
Brampton ON L6V 1C2
Phone: 905-455-6464
Fax: 1-866-265-9976
Address: Guelph General Hospital
Guelph Ontario N1E 4J4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 7600 Weston Rd
Woodbridge ON L4L 8B7
Phone: (289) 371-3500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 01 May 2019
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 01 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
Homewood Health Centre Guelph
HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

HOSPITAL: Homewood Health Centre
LOCATION: Guelph

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Chahal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Chahal (CPSO#: 117720 )
Business Address: 115 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 4J4
Business Address: Homewood Health Centre
150 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 4J4
Business Address: 148 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 4J4

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
25 Sep 2020
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Sep 25 2020
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. KHUSHMINDER SINGH CHAHAL may practise medicine independently in psychiatry.


VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. KHUSHMINDER SINGH CHAHAL may practise medicine independently in psychiatry.


Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Academy of Medicine, Lublin, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 25 Sep 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 May 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 25 Sep 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 May 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 May 2019