THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 13:15:06 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Mashhad University of Medical Science, 1999
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1165 Barton St
Curan's Heart Centre
Thunder Bay ON P7B 5N3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 807-345-3355
Fax: 807-345-0099

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 01 Jul 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Curans Heart Centre
1165 Barton St, Thunder Bay, ON P7B 5N3
Phone (807) 345-3355
Fax (807) 345-0099
Date Received: 25 Oct 2022

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vahid Akbari Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Jul 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Akbari (CPSO#: 117742 )
Business Address: 416 Longbow St
Thunder Bay ON P7G 0A8
(807) 708-7403

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Mashhad University of Medical Science, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1165 Barton St
Curan's Heart Centre
Thunder Bay ON P7B 5N3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 807-345-3355
Fax: 807-345-0099

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 01 Jul 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Curans Heart Centre
1165 Barton St, Thunder Bay, ON P7B 5N3
Phone (807) 345-3355
Fax (807) 345-0099
Date Received: 25 Oct 2022

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vahid Akbari Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Jul 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Akbari (CPSO#: 117742 )
Business Address: 416 Longbow St
Thunder Bay ON P7G 0A8
(807) 708-7403

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
01 Jul 2022
30 Jun 2029
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jul 01 2022
EXPIRY DATE: Jun 30 2029
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. VAHID AKBARI may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Clinical Sciences at the Northern Ontario School of Medicine, in which Dr. AKBARI holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. AKBARI no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. AKBARI’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. AKBARI’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 01 July, 2022. In accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the Registration Committee, automatically expire on 30 June, 2029.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. VAHID AKBARI may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Clinical Sciences at the Northern Ontario School of Medicine, in which Dr. AKBARI holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. AKBARI no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. AKBARI’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. AKBARI’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 01 July, 2022. In accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the Registration Committee, automatically expire on 30 June, 2029.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Mashhad University of Medical Science, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2022
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2029

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2022

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jul 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019