THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:15:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Al Quds University, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 580 Harwood Avenue South
Lakeridge Health Ajax-Pickering Hospital
Department of Medicine
Ajax Ontario L1S 2J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 683-2320
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1 Hospital Court
Lakeridge Health Oshawa Hospital
Department of Medicine
Oshawa Ontario L1G 8A1
Phone: 905-576-8711
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 03 Jan 2025
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 03 2025
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: ASMAA ABUMUAMAR MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jan 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Abumuamar (CPSO#: 117743 )
Business Address: 580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax Ontario L1S 2J4

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Al Quds University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 580 Harwood Avenue South
Lakeridge Health Ajax-Pickering Hospital
Department of Medicine
Ajax Ontario L1S 2J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 683-2320
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1 Hospital Court
Lakeridge Health Oshawa Hospital
Department of Medicine
Oshawa Ontario L1G 8A1
Phone: 905-576-8711
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 03 Jan 2025
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 03 2025
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: ASMAA ABUMUAMAR MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jan 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Abumuamar (CPSO#: 117743 )
Business Address: 580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax Ontario L1S 2J4

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ASMAA M Y ABUMUAMAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABUMUAMAR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ASMAA M Y ABUMUAMAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABUMUAMAR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Al Quds University, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 2025
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jan 2025

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019