THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:10:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Medical University of Vienna, 2009
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GERMAN, POLISH, UKRAINIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 411 Louth St
St. Catharines ON L2S 4A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 684-8555
Fax: (905) 378-2818
Address: 4303 167 Ave NW
Edmonton AB T5Y 3Y2
Phone: (780) 705-8400
Extension: 5
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Dec 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 05 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Oksana Boychuk Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Mar 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. O. Boychuk (CPSO#: 117764 )
Business Address: 411 Louth St
St Catharines ON L2S 4A2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GERMAN, POLISH, UKRAINIAN
Medical School: Medical University of Vienna, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 411 Louth St
St. Catharines ON L2S 4A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 684-8555
Fax: (905) 378-2818
Address: 4303 167 Ave NW
Edmonton AB T5Y 3Y2
Phone: (780) 705-8400
Extension: 5
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Dec 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 05 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Oksana Boychuk Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Mar 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. O. Boychuk (CPSO#: 117764 )
Business Address: 411 Louth St
St Catharines ON L2S 4A2

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OKSANA BOYCHUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOYCHUK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OKSANA BOYCHUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOYCHUK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Medical University of Vienna, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Apr 2019
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Apr 2019