THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:50:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, BENGALI, JAPANESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-743-2121
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S M Nazmus Sakib Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jun 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sakib (CPSO#: 117767 )
Business Address: 7199 Gelert Road
Haliburton Ontario K0M 1S0
(705) 457-1392
Business Address: 146 Oliver Road
Campbellford Ontario K0L 1L0
(705) 653-1140
Business Address: 10 Angelina Street North
Lindsay Ontario K9V 4M8
(705) 324-6111
Business Address: 1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
(705) 743-2121

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, BENGALI, JAPANESE
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-743-2121
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S M Nazmus Sakib Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jun 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sakib (CPSO#: 117767 )
Business Address: 7199 Gelert Road
Haliburton Ontario K0M 1S0
(705) 457-1392
Business Address: 146 Oliver Road
Campbellford Ontario K0L 1L0
(705) 653-1140
Business Address: 10 Angelina Street North
Lindsay Ontario K9V 4M8
(705) 324-6111
Business Address: 1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
(705) 743-2121

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. S M NAZMUS SAKIB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAKIB is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. S M NAZMUS SAKIB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAKIB is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Oct 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Oct 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Aug 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019