THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
25/05/25 03:51:43 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Modena, 2008
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 600 University Ave
Mount Sinai Hospital
Division of Cardiology
Toronto ON M5G 1X5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: +1 416-596-4200
Fax: No Information Available
Address: UHN Toronto General Hospital
Division of Cardiology
200 Elizabeth St
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Phone: 4163403155
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 01 May 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 01 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Italy

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. LISA ALBERTINI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Jan 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Albertini (CPSO#: 117773 )
Business Address: 87 Sarah Ashbridge Ave
Toronto ON M4L 3Y1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN
Medical School: University of Modena, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 600 University Ave
Mount Sinai Hospital
Division of Cardiology
Toronto ON M5G 1X5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: +1 416-596-4200
Fax: No Information Available
Address: UHN Toronto General Hospital
Division of Cardiology
200 Elizabeth St
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Phone: 4163403155
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 01 May 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 01 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Italy

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. LISA ALBERTINI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Jan 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Albertini (CPSO#: 117773 )
Business Address: 87 Sarah Ashbridge Ave
Toronto ON M4L 3Y1

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
01 May 2023
30 Apr 2030
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: May 01 2023
EXPIRY DATE: Apr 30 2030
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. LISA ALBERTINI may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine, Division of Cardiology, University of Toronto, in which Dr. ALBERTINI holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. ALBERTINI no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. ALBERTINI’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. ALBERTINI’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 01 May, 2023. In accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the Registration Committee, automatically expire on 30 April, 2030.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. LISA ALBERTINI may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine, Division of Cardiology, University of Toronto, in which Dr. ALBERTINI holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. ALBERTINI no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. ALBERTINI’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. ALBERTINI’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 01 May, 2023. In accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the Registration Committee, automatically expire on 30 April, 2030.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Modena, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 May 2023
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 May 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 May 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 30 Apr 2030

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Aug 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2019