THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
12/05/25 05:29:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 2006
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 237 Barton St E
Hamilton ON L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 44551
Fax: (905) 577-1466

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 10 May 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 10 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Chedoke Hospital Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre Regional Rehabilitation Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Chedoke Hospital Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre Regional Rehabilitation Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. ESLAM SHOSHA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Aug 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Shosha (CPSO#: 117805 )
Business Address: 237 Barton St E
Hamilton ON L8L 2X2
905-521-2100 Extn: 44551

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 237 Barton St E
Hamilton ON L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 44551
Fax: (905) 577-1466

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 10 May 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 10 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Chedoke Hospital Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre Regional Rehabilitation Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Chedoke Hospital Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre Regional Rehabilitation Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. ESLAM SHOSHA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Aug 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Shosha (CPSO#: 117805 )
Business Address: 237 Barton St E
Hamilton ON L8L 2X2
905-521-2100 Extn: 44551

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ESLAM HAMDY MAHMOUD SHOSHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHOSHA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ESLAM HAMDY MAHMOUD SHOSHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHOSHA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 2024
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 01 Jul 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 28 Apr 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jun 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 29 Apr 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Oct 2024

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Nov 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 20 Nov 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 28 Apr 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jun 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Apr 2019