THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:26:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Michigan State University (Osteopathic), 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Elite Medical Centre
110 - 250 Tecumseh Rd E
Windsor Ontario N8X 2R3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 971-2901
Fax: (519) 971-2902
Address: 2-1291 Wyandotte St E
Trillium Medical Centre
Windsor ON N9A 3K6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 29 Apr 2019
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 29 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Alsmoudi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Jun 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Alsmoudi (CPSO#: 117816 )
Business Address: 250 Tecumseh Road East
Suite 110
Windsor Ontario N8X 2R3
(519) 971-2901

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Michigan State University (Osteopathic), 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Elite Medical Centre
110 - 250 Tecumseh Rd E
Windsor Ontario N8X 2R3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 971-2901
Fax: (519) 971-2902
Address: 2-1291 Wyandotte St E
Trillium Medical Centre
Windsor ON N9A 3K6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 29 Apr 2019
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 29 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Alsmoudi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Jun 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Alsmoudi (CPSO#: 117816 )
Business Address: 250 Tecumseh Road East
Suite 110
Windsor Ontario N8X 2R3
(519) 971-2901

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
19 Feb 2021
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Feb 19 2021
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. SARIEA ALSMOUDI may practise medicine independently in family medicine.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. SARIEA ALSMOUDI may practise medicine independently in family medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Michigan State University (Osteopathic), 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 19 Feb 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 29 Apr 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 19 Feb 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Apr 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 29 Apr 2019