THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:17:43 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Hawler Medical University, 2009
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 500 Huronia Road
201
Barrie Ontario L4N 8X3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7055035355
Fax: 7055035455

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: SHANI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Feb 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Shani (CPSO#: 117832 )
Business Address: B12-411 Bayfield St
Barrie ON L4M 6E5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Hawler Medical University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 500 Huronia Road
201
Barrie Ontario L4N 8X3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7055035355
Fax: 7055035455

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: SHANI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Feb 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Shani (CPSO#: 117832 )
Business Address: B12-411 Bayfield St
Barrie ON L4M 6E5

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SANDY AUGUS MANSOR SHANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHANI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SANDY AUGUS MANSOR SHANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHANI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Hawler Medical University, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 02 Aug 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Sep 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 02 Aug 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019