THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 04:19:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: RAK College of Medical Sciences, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 8-71 Speers Rd
Oakville ON L6K 0J2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (289) 796-0052
Fax: (289) 715-2252
Address: 3420 Hurontario St
Mississauga ON L5B 4A9
Phone: (905) 272-0165
Fax: 905-272-4082
Address: 8-71 Speers Rd
Oakville ON L6K 0J2
Phone: (289) 796-0052
Fax: (289) 715-2252

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shahad Abdulmajeed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Dec 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Abdulmajeed (CPSO#: 117833 )
Business Address: 71 Speers Rd
Unit 08
Oakville ON L6K 0J2
(289) 796-0052

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: RAK College of Medical Sciences, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 8-71 Speers Rd
Oakville ON L6K 0J2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (289) 796-0052
Fax: (289) 715-2252
Address: 3420 Hurontario St
Mississauga ON L5B 4A9
Phone: (905) 272-0165
Fax: 905-272-4082
Address: 8-71 Speers Rd
Oakville ON L6K 0J2
Phone: (289) 796-0052
Fax: (289) 715-2252

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shahad Abdulmajeed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Dec 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Abdulmajeed (CPSO#: 117833 )
Business Address: 71 Speers Rd
Unit 08
Oakville ON L6K 0J2
(289) 796-0052

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHAHAD DHIA ABDULMAJEED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDULMAJEED is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHAHAD DHIA ABDULMAJEED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDULMAJEED is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: RAK College of Medical Sciences, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019