THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:24:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Islamic Azad University, 2009
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 12-1700 King Rd
King City ON L7B 0N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-833-8421
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 6-2035 Sheppard Ave E
North York ON M2J 0A8
Phone: 416-493-0003
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 27 Jun 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 27 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Iran

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR.FARZI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Nov 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Farzi (CPSO#: 117837 )
Business Address: 1700 King Road
Unit 12
King City Ontario L7B 0N1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Islamic Azad University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 12-1700 King Rd
King City ON L7B 0N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-833-8421
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 6-2035 Sheppard Ave E
North York ON M2J 0A8
Phone: 416-493-0003
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 27 Jun 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 27 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Iran

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR.FARZI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Nov 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Farzi (CPSO#: 117837 )
Business Address: 1700 King Road
Unit 12
King City Ontario L7B 0N1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAHAR FARZI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FARZI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAHAR FARZI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FARZI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Islamic Azad University, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2023

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019