THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:09:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: First Moscow State Medical University, 2004
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1108 Klondike Rd
Kanata Ontario K2K 0G1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 254-9777
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Apr 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 26 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Pennsylvania

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shestopalova Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Feb 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Shestopalova (CPSO#: 117856 )
Business Address: ActiveCare
1108 Klondike Road
Kanata Ontario K2K 0G1
(613) 254-9777

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: First Moscow State Medical University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1108 Klondike Rd
Kanata Ontario K2K 0G1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 254-9777
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Apr 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 26 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Pennsylvania

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shestopalova Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Feb 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Shestopalova (CPSO#: 117856 )
Business Address: ActiveCare
1108 Klondike Road
Kanata Ontario K2K 0G1
(613) 254-9777

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANNA SHESTOPALOVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHESTOPALOVA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANNA SHESTOPALOVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHESTOPALOVA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: First Moscow State Medical University, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 May 2019
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 May 2019