THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 05:11:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Barts and the London School of Medicine and Dentistry, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 204-490 Bramalea Rd.
Brampton Ontario L6T 0G1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9057900400
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 28 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 28 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Seedat Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 May 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Seedat (CPSO#: 117888 )
Business Address: Healthpoint Medicine
490 Bramalea Road
Suite 204
Brampton Ontario L6T 0G1
(905) 792-6500

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Barts and the London School of Medicine and Dentistry, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 204-490 Bramalea Rd.
Brampton Ontario L6T 0G1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9057900400
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 28 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 28 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Seedat Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 May 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Seedat (CPSO#: 117888 )
Business Address: Healthpoint Medicine
490 Bramalea Road
Suite 204
Brampton Ontario L6T 0G1
(905) 792-6500

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SALMA FAROOK SEEDAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEEDAT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SALMA FAROOK SEEDAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEEDAT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Barts and the London School of Medicine and Dentistry, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 06 May 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jan 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 May 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 06 May 2019