THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 05:49:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1997
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Ave
Room 435
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 586-4800
Extension: 4304
Fax: 416-586-4763

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 21 Sep 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Laura Targownik Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Targownik (CPSO#: 117900 )
Business Address: Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
(416) 596-4200

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Ave
Room 435
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 586-4800
Extension: 4304
Fax: 416-586-4763

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 21 Sep 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Laura Targownik Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Targownik (CPSO#: 117900 )
Business Address: Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
(416) 596-4200

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAURA ELLYN TARGOWNIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TARGOWNIK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAURA ELLYN TARGOWNIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TARGOWNIK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Canadian Medical Regulatory Authorities
Notice Type: External Findings - Other Regulatory Body
Effective Date: 05 Mar 2020
Summary:
The following is a disciplinary finding made against this member by a non-Ontario Medical Regulatory Authority, as known to the College:

On March 5, 2020, the Investigation Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Manitoba ordered that Dr. Targownik be censured for CPSM’s finding that Dr. Targownik engaged in unacceptable conduct for a physician, breached the expected standard of professionalism and contravened the Code of Ethics. CPSO learned of this finding on March 9, 2020. 

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Canadian Medical Regulatory Authorities
Notice Type: External Findings - Other Regulatory Body
Effective Date: 05 Mar 2020
Summary:
The following is a disciplinary finding made against this member by a non-Ontario Medical Regulatory Authority, as known to the College:

On March 5, 2020, the Investigation Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Manitoba ordered that Dr. Targownik be censured for CPSM’s finding that Dr. Targownik engaged in unacceptable conduct for a physician, breached the expected standard of professionalism and contravened the Code of Ethics. CPSO learned of this finding on March 9, 2020. 

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 May 2019
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 May 2019