THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 04:21:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Shiraz University, 1987
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 16 Yonge St
1clinic
unit k
Toronto ON M5E 2A1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4162582551
Fax: 416 266 2955

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. ARYAN SHOJAEI-FARD MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 08 Mar 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Shiraz University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 16 Yonge St
1clinic
unit k
Toronto ON M5E 2A1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4162582551
Fax: 416 266 2955

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. ARYAN SHOJAEI-FARD MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 08 Mar 2024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ARYAN SHOJAEI-FARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHOJAEI-FARD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ARYAN SHOJAEI-FARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHOJAEI-FARD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Shiraz University, 1987

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Dec 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019