THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:49:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 2005
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Mental Health and Addiction Program
204-240 Grand Ave W
Chatham ON N7L 1C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519)351-6144
Extension: 5340
Fax: (519) 351-0450

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 17 May 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 17 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Saskatchewan
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
HOSPITAL: Lake of the Woods District Hospital
LOCATION: Kenora

HOSPITAL: Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
LOCATION: Chatham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. MASAUD MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Masaud (CPSO#: 117952 )
Business Address: 204-240 Grand Ave W
Chatham ON N7L 1C1
5194366100

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Mental Health and Addiction Program
204-240 Grand Ave W
Chatham ON N7L 1C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519)351-6144
Extension: 5340
Fax: (519) 351-0450

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 17 May 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 17 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Saskatchewan
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
HOSPITAL: Lake of the Woods District Hospital
LOCATION: Kenora

HOSPITAL: Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
LOCATION: Chatham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. MASAUD MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Masaud (CPSO#: 117952 )
Business Address: 204-240 Grand Ave W
Chatham ON N7L 1C1
5194366100

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TAWFIK MASAUD A MASAUD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MASAUD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TAWFIK MASAUD A MASAUD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MASAUD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 May 2019
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 May 2019