THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
25/05/25 03:25:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2019
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 201 Georgian Drive
3rd floor Cancer Centre
Barrie Ontario L4M 7B7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-728-9090
Extension: 43333
Fax: 705-739-5619

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 23 Aug 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 23 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: CORALEA KAPPEL MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Dec 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Kappel (CPSO#: 117976 )
Business Address: 201 Georgian Drive
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
Cancer Centre 3rd floor
Barrie Ontario L4M 7B7
705-728-9090 Extn: 43333

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 201 Georgian Drive
3rd floor Cancer Centre
Barrie Ontario L4M 7B7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-728-9090
Extension: 43333
Fax: 705-739-5619

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 23 Aug 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 23 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: CORALEA KAPPEL MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Dec 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Kappel (CPSO#: 117976 )
Business Address: 201 Georgian Drive
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
Cancer Centre 3rd floor
Barrie Ontario L4M 7B7
705-728-9090 Extn: 43333

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CORALEA KAPPEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAPPEL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CORALEA KAPPEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAPPEL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jul 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 29 Jul 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019