THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:19:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: Singh, Jasjit Kaur (Used Until: 17 Sep 2017)
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2019
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2100 Bovaird Dr E
Brampton ON L6R 3J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-494-2120
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2300 Yonge St
Unit 906
Toronto ON M4P 1E4
Phone: 0
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rooprai Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Jan 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Rooprai (CPSO#: 117987 )
Business Address: 2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
905-494-2120

General Information

Former Name: Singh, Jasjit Kaur (Used Until: 17 Sep 2017)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2100 Bovaird Dr E
Brampton ON L6R 3J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-494-2120
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2300 Yonge St
Unit 906
Toronto ON M4P 1E4
Phone: 0
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rooprai Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Jan 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Rooprai (CPSO#: 117987 )
Business Address: 2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
905-494-2120

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JASJIT KAUR ROOPRAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROOPRAI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JASJIT KAUR ROOPRAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROOPRAI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019