THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 04:54:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2019
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1040 Brookes St
North Bay Indigenous Hub
North Bay ON P1B 2N6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7059950060
Fax: 7059952155
Address: 50 College Dr
Hospital
Family Medicine
North Bay ON P1B 0A4
Phone: 705-474-8600
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1040 Brookes St
North Bay Indigenous Hub
North Bay ON P1B 2N6
Phone: 705 995 0060
Fax: 705 995 2155

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: North Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Bridget M. McDonald Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jun 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. B. McDonald (CPSO#: 117988 )
Business Address: 50 College Dr
North Bay ON P1B 5A4
Business Address: 1040 Brookes St
North Bay Indigenous Hub
North Bay ON P1B 2N6

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1040 Brookes St
North Bay Indigenous Hub
North Bay ON P1B 2N6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7059950060
Fax: 7059952155
Address: 50 College Dr
Hospital
Family Medicine
North Bay ON P1B 0A4
Phone: 705-474-8600
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1040 Brookes St
North Bay Indigenous Hub
North Bay ON P1B 2N6
Phone: 705 995 0060
Fax: 705 995 2155

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: North Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Bridget M. McDonald Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jun 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. B. McDonald (CPSO#: 117988 )
Business Address: 50 College Dr
North Bay ON P1B 5A4
Business Address: 1040 Brookes St
North Bay Indigenous Hub
North Bay ON P1B 2N6

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRIDGET MARJORIE MCDONALD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCDONALD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRIDGET MARJORIE MCDONALD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCDONALD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019