THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:13:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2017
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 650 Church St
Toronto Grace Hospital
Toronto ON M4Y 2G5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4169252251
Extension: 265
Fax: 6476893554
Address: 920 Princess Street
Limestone City Sleep Laboratory
Suite 110
Kingston Ontario K7L 1H1
Phone: (613) 547-9172
Fax: (613) 547-9910
Address: 764 Baker Crescent
Hospital Alliance Group
Kingston Ontario K7M 6P6
Phone: 613-389-4400
Fax: 613-389-4450
Address: 108-4040 Finch Ave E
Scarborough ON M1S 4V5
Phone: (416) 293-3233
Fax: (416) 293-0692

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 16 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Salvation Army Toronto Grace Health Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Salvation Army Toronto Grace Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. CHRISTOPHER HUMPHREYS MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Dec 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Humphreys (CPSO#: 118039 )
Business Address: 650 Church St
Toronto ON M4Y 2G5
4169252251 Extn: 265

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 650 Church St
Toronto Grace Hospital
Toronto ON M4Y 2G5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4169252251
Extension: 265
Fax: 6476893554
Address: 920 Princess Street
Limestone City Sleep Laboratory
Suite 110
Kingston Ontario K7L 1H1
Phone: (613) 547-9172
Fax: (613) 547-9910
Address: 764 Baker Crescent
Hospital Alliance Group
Kingston Ontario K7M 6P6
Phone: 613-389-4400
Fax: 613-389-4450
Address: 108-4040 Finch Ave E
Scarborough ON M1S 4V5
Phone: (416) 293-3233
Fax: (416) 293-0692

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 16 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Salvation Army Toronto Grace Health Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Salvation Army Toronto Grace Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. CHRISTOPHER HUMPHREYS MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Dec 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Humphreys (CPSO#: 118039 )
Business Address: 650 Church St
Toronto ON M4Y 2G5
4169252251 Extn: 265

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER JAMES HUMPHREYS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUMPHREYS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER JAMES HUMPHREYS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUMPHREYS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 28 Jul 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 28 Jul 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019