THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 04:14:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2019
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 60 Cornelia St W
Smiths Falls DIstrict Hospital
Emergency Department
Smiths Falls ON K7A 2H9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613 283 2330
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 117 Banting Dr
Deep River District Hospital
Emergency Department
Deep River ON K0J 1P0
Phone: 6135843333
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 705 Mackay Street
Pembroke Ontario K8A 1G8
Phone: (613) 732-2811
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 33 Drummond St W
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital - Perth Site
Emergency Department
Perth ON K7H 2K1
Phone: (613) 283-2330
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Perth
Deep River and District Hospital Deep River
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
HOSPITAL: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site
LOCATION: Smiths Falls

HOSPITAL: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital
LOCATION: Perth

HOSPITAL: Deep River and District Hospital
LOCATION: Deep River

HOSPITAL: Pembroke Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Pembroke

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John F. White Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Dec 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. J. White (CPSO#: 118060 )
Business Address: 117 Banting Dr
Deep River ON K0J 1P0
Business Address: 705 Mackay St
Pembroke ON K8A 1G8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 60 Cornelia St W
Smiths Falls DIstrict Hospital
Emergency Department
Smiths Falls ON K7A 2H9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613 283 2330
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 117 Banting Dr
Deep River District Hospital
Emergency Department
Deep River ON K0J 1P0
Phone: 6135843333
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 705 Mackay Street
Pembroke Ontario K8A 1G8
Phone: (613) 732-2811
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 33 Drummond St W
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital - Perth Site
Emergency Department
Perth ON K7H 2K1
Phone: (613) 283-2330
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Perth
Deep River and District Hospital Deep River
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
HOSPITAL: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site
LOCATION: Smiths Falls

HOSPITAL: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital
LOCATION: Perth

HOSPITAL: Deep River and District Hospital
LOCATION: Deep River

HOSPITAL: Pembroke Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Pembroke

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John F. White Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Dec 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. J. White (CPSO#: 118060 )
Business Address: 117 Banting Dr
Deep River ON K0J 1P0
Business Address: 705 Mackay St
Pembroke ON K8A 1G8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN FRASER WHITE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WHITE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN FRASER WHITE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WHITE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019