THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:26:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2019
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2125 Front Rd
Lasalle Medical Associates
Lasalle ON N9J 2C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519 734 1234
Fax: 519 734 8674

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. MILIC MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Mar 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Milic (CPSO#: 118066 )
Business Address: 2125 Front Road
LaSalle Ontario N9J

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2125 Front Rd
Lasalle Medical Associates
Lasalle ON N9J 2C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519 734 1234
Fax: 519 734 8674

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. MILIC MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Mar 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Milic (CPSO#: 118066 )
Business Address: 2125 Front Road
LaSalle Ontario N9J

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOVANA MILIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILIC is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOVANA MILIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILIC is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019