THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 05:35:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2019
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2000-1415 1st Ave W
Owen Sound Family Health Organization
Owen Sound ON N4K 4K8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-470-3030
Fax: 519-370-4056
Address: 1800 8th St E
Brightshores Health System
Urban Family Medicine
Owen Sound ON N4K 6M9
Phone: 519-376-2121
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brightshores Health System Owen Sound
HOSPITAL: Brightshores Health System
LOCATION: Owen Sound

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Brooke Edwards Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Apr 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Edwards (CPSO#: 118068 )
Business Address: 2000-1415 1st Ave W
Owen Sound ON N4K 4K8
519-470-3030

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2000-1415 1st Ave W
Owen Sound Family Health Organization
Owen Sound ON N4K 4K8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-470-3030
Fax: 519-370-4056
Address: 1800 8th St E
Brightshores Health System
Urban Family Medicine
Owen Sound ON N4K 6M9
Phone: 519-376-2121
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brightshores Health System Owen Sound
HOSPITAL: Brightshores Health System
LOCATION: Owen Sound

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Brooke Edwards Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Apr 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Edwards (CPSO#: 118068 )
Business Address: 2000-1415 1st Ave W
Owen Sound ON N4K 4K8
519-470-3030

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BROOKE ELIZABETH EDWARDS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EDWARDS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BROOKE ELIZABETH EDWARDS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EDWARDS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019