THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 03:49:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Western University, 2019
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1051 Wonderland Rd S
London ON N6K 3X4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519 472 2060
Fax: (519) 471 7299

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Leah Sinai Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Sep 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Sinai (CPSO#: 118105 )
Business Address: 1051 Wonderland Road South
London Ontario N6K 3X4
5194722060

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Western University, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1051 Wonderland Rd S
London ON N6K 3X4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519 472 2060
Fax: (519) 471 7299

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Leah Sinai Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Sep 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Sinai (CPSO#: 118105 )
Business Address: 1051 Wonderland Road South
London Ontario N6K 3X4
5194722060

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LEAH JORDAN SINAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINAI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LEAH JORDAN SINAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINAI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Western University, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019