THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 06:09:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Western University, 2019
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: 5196858500
Extension: 76066
Fax: 18884520248
Address: 268 Grosvenor Street
St. Joseph's Hospital
Heart Failure Clinic
London Ontario N6A 3N3
Phone: 5196858500
Extension: 76066
Fax: 5196466219
Address: 310 Juliana Dr
Woodstock Hospital
Department of Medicine
Woodstock ON N4V 0A4
Phone: 4167052393
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
Woodstock Hospital Woodstock
Bluewater Health Sarnia
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: Woodstock Hospital
LOCATION: Woodstock

HOSPITAL: Bluewater Health
LOCATION: Sarnia

HOSPITAL: St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital
LOCATION: St Thomas

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: ROBERT T. SPARROW MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Jan 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Sparrow (CPSO#: 118108 )
Business Address: 800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Western University, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: 5196858500
Extension: 76066
Fax: 18884520248
Address: 268 Grosvenor Street
St. Joseph's Hospital
Heart Failure Clinic
London Ontario N6A 3N3
Phone: 5196858500
Extension: 76066
Fax: 5196466219
Address: 310 Juliana Dr
Woodstock Hospital
Department of Medicine
Woodstock ON N4V 0A4
Phone: 4167052393
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
Woodstock Hospital Woodstock
Bluewater Health Sarnia
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: Woodstock Hospital
LOCATION: Woodstock

HOSPITAL: Bluewater Health
LOCATION: Sarnia

HOSPITAL: St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital
LOCATION: St Thomas

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: ROBERT T. SPARROW MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Jan 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Sparrow (CPSO#: 118108 )
Business Address: 800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT THOMAS SPARROW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SPARROW is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT THOMAS SPARROW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SPARROW is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Western University, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Aug 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 15 Aug 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019