THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:29:42 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2019
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1 Bridgepoint Dr
Toronto ON M4M 2B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4164618252
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
Bridgepoint Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Bridgepoint Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. FEI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Jun 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Fei (CPSO#: 118112 )
Business Address: 1 Bridgepoint Dr
Toronto ON M4M 2B5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1 Bridgepoint Dr
Toronto ON M4M 2B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4164618252
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
Bridgepoint Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Bridgepoint Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. FEI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Jun 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Fei (CPSO#: 118112 )
Business Address: 1 Bridgepoint Dr
Toronto ON M4M 2B5

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ZHIYE FEI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FEI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ZHIYE FEI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FEI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019