THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
25/05/25 04:15:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2019
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3-4130 Glenview Rd
Petrolia ON N0N 1R0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5198822500
Fax: 5198824321
Address: 450 Blanche St
Charlotte Eleanor Englehart Hospital
Emergency Department
Petrolia ON N0N 1R0
Phone: 5198824325
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 189 Elm St
St. Thomas Elgin General Hospital
Hospitalist Program
St Thomas ON N5R 5C4
Phone: 519-631-2030
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
Bluewater Health Charlotte Eleanor Englehart Site Petrolia
Bluewater Health Sarnia
HOSPITAL: St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital
LOCATION: St Thomas

HOSPITAL: Bluewater Health Charlotte Eleanor Englehart Site
LOCATION: Petrolia

HOSPITAL: Bluewater Health
LOCATION: Sarnia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Koreman Moon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 May 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Koreman (CPSO#: 118120 ) Dr. P. Moon (CPSO#: 118115 )
Business Address: 89 Norman St
Sarnia ON N7T 6S3
5194644400
Business Address: 3-4130 Glenview Rd
Petrolia ON N0N 1R0
5198822500
Business Address: 450 Blanche St
Petrolia ON N0N 1R0
5198824325
Business Address: 189 Elm St
St Thomas ON N5R 5C4
5196312020

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3-4130 Glenview Rd
Petrolia ON N0N 1R0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5198822500
Fax: 5198824321
Address: 450 Blanche St
Charlotte Eleanor Englehart Hospital
Emergency Department
Petrolia ON N0N 1R0
Phone: 5198824325
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 189 Elm St
St. Thomas Elgin General Hospital
Hospitalist Program
St Thomas ON N5R 5C4
Phone: 519-631-2030
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
Bluewater Health Charlotte Eleanor Englehart Site Petrolia
Bluewater Health Sarnia
HOSPITAL: St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital
LOCATION: St Thomas

HOSPITAL: Bluewater Health Charlotte Eleanor Englehart Site
LOCATION: Petrolia

HOSPITAL: Bluewater Health
LOCATION: Sarnia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Koreman Moon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 May 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Koreman (CPSO#: 118120 ) Dr. P. Moon (CPSO#: 118115 )
Business Address: 89 Norman St
Sarnia ON N7T 6S3
5194644400
Business Address: 3-4130 Glenview Rd
Petrolia ON N0N 1R0
5198822500
Business Address: 450 Blanche St
Petrolia ON N0N 1R0
5198824325
Business Address: 189 Elm St
St Thomas ON N5R 5C4
5196312020

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TIANNA LYNN KOREMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOREMAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TIANNA LYNN KOREMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOREMAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019