THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
24/05/25 04:42:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2019
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 89 Norman Street
Sarnia Ontario N7T
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5194644400
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nap Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Jan 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Nap (CPSO#: 118127 )
Business Address: 87 Norman Street
Sarnia Ontario N7T

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 89 Norman Street
Sarnia Ontario N7T
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5194644400
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nap Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Jan 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Nap (CPSO#: 118127 )
Business Address: 87 Norman Street
Sarnia Ontario N7T

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DEREK ALEXANDER NAP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAP is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DEREK ALEXANDER NAP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAP is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Sep 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 06 Sep 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019