THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 05:39:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2019
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 808 Dufferin Ave
Wallaceburg ON N8A 2V4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-397-5455
Fax: 519-627-8652

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
HOSPITAL: Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
LOCATION: Chatham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: H. Y. SU MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Aug 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Su (CPSO#: 118137 )
Business Address: 60 Murray St
4th floor
Toronto ON M5T 3L9
4165864800
Business Address: 808 Dufferin Ave
Wallaceburg ON N8A 2V4
519-397-5455

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 808 Dufferin Ave
Wallaceburg ON N8A 2V4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-397-5455
Fax: 519-627-8652

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
HOSPITAL: Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
LOCATION: Chatham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: H. Y. SU MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Aug 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Su (CPSO#: 118137 )
Business Address: 60 Murray St
4th floor
Toronto ON M5T 3L9
4165864800
Business Address: 808 Dufferin Ave
Wallaceburg ON N8A 2V4
519-397-5455

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HONG YU SU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HONG YU SU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019