THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 01:49:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Sheffield University School of Medicine and Biomedical Sciences, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 20-360 Highway 7 E
Richmond Hill ON L4B 3Y7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 881-0360
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. E. Lee-Cheong & M. Mair Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mair (CPSO#: 118162 ) Dr. E. Lee-Cheong (CPSO#: 120687 )
Business Address: 22-360 Highway 7 E
Richmond Hill ON L4B 3Y7
9058810360

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Sheffield University School of Medicine and Biomedical Sciences, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 20-360 Highway 7 E
Richmond Hill ON L4B 3Y7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 881-0360
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. E. Lee-Cheong & M. Mair Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mair (CPSO#: 118162 ) Dr. E. Lee-Cheong (CPSO#: 120687 )
Business Address: 22-360 Highway 7 E
Richmond Hill ON L4B 3Y7
9058810360

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHELLE LOUISE MAIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAIR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHELLE LOUISE MAIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAIR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Sheffield University School of Medicine and Biomedical Sciences, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019