THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 03:52:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2019
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1 Bridgepoint Dr
Toronto ON M4M 2B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-461-8252
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Runnymede Healthcare Centre Toronto
Atikokan Health and Community Services Atikokan
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health Toronto
Bridgepoint Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Runnymede Healthcare Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Atikokan Health and Community Services
LOCATION: Atikokan

HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Bridgepoint Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gray Moonen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Jun 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Moonen (CPSO#: 118215 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1 Bridgepoint Dr
Toronto ON M4M 2B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-461-8252
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Runnymede Healthcare Centre Toronto
Atikokan Health and Community Services Atikokan
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health Toronto
Bridgepoint Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Runnymede Healthcare Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Atikokan Health and Community Services
LOCATION: Atikokan

HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Bridgepoint Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gray Moonen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Jun 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Moonen (CPSO#: 118215 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GRAY MOONEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOONEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GRAY MOONEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOONEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019