THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 22:11:44 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2019
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-211 Pritchard Rd
Palliative Care Outreach Team
Greater Hamilton Area
Hamilton ON L8J 0G5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 289-919-1165
Fax: 905-574-6335

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. PRIYA GUPTA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Feb 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Gupta (CPSO#: 118249 )
Business Address: 211 Pritchard Road
Unit 1
Hamilton Ontario L8W 0B4
289-919-1165

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: McMaster University, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-211 Pritchard Rd
Palliative Care Outreach Team
Greater Hamilton Area
Hamilton ON L8J 0G5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 289-919-1165
Fax: 905-574-6335

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. PRIYA GUPTA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Feb 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Gupta (CPSO#: 118249 )
Business Address: 211 Pritchard Road
Unit 1
Hamilton Ontario L8W 0B4
289-919-1165

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PRIYA GUPTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUPTA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PRIYA GUPTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUPTA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019