THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:28:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2019
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1 Princess Anne Dr
Georgetown ON L7G 2B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 873-0111
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON L6M 0L8
Phone: (905) 845-2571
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3276 St Clair Ave E
Scarborough ON M1L 1W1
Phone: (416) 285-3666
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3200 Major Mackenzie Drive West
Vaughan Ontario L6A 5A9
Phone: (905) 417-2000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Providence Care Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital
LOCATION: Georgetown

HOSPITAL: Providence Care Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. MUSTAFA MOHAMEDALI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Apr 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mohamedali (CPSO#: 118250 )
Business Address: 1 Princess Anne Drive
Halton Hills Ontario L7G 2B8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1 Princess Anne Dr
Georgetown ON L7G 2B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 873-0111
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON L6M 0L8
Phone: (905) 845-2571
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3276 St Clair Ave E
Scarborough ON M1L 1W1
Phone: (416) 285-3666
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3200 Major Mackenzie Drive West
Vaughan Ontario L6A 5A9
Phone: (905) 417-2000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Providence Care Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital
LOCATION: Georgetown

HOSPITAL: Providence Care Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. MUSTAFA MOHAMEDALI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Apr 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mohamedali (CPSO#: 118250 )
Business Address: 1 Princess Anne Drive
Halton Hills Ontario L7G 2B8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MUSTAFA MOHAMEDALI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOHAMEDALI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MUSTAFA MOHAMEDALI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOHAMEDALI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019