THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 05:08:05 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2019
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-40 Innovation Dr
Woodbridge ON L4H 0T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058512444
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. I. SHAH MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Jan 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Shah (CPSO#: 118252 )
Business Address: 1-40 Innovation Dr
Woodbridge ON L4H 0T2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU
Medical School: McMaster University, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-40 Innovation Dr
Woodbridge ON L4H 0T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058512444
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. I. SHAH MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Jan 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Shah (CPSO#: 118252 )
Business Address: 1-40 Innovation Dr
Woodbridge ON L4H 0T2

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IFRAH SHAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IFRAH SHAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019