THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:43:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2019
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4001 Leslie St
North York General Hospital
North York ON M2K 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-756-6529
Fax: 416-756-6024
Address: 3080 Yonge St
Suite 5080
Toronto ON M4N 3N1
Phone: 416-782-4447
Fax: 416-782-1284

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Sinha Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jan 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Sinha (CPSO#: 118269 )
Business Address: 5080-3080 Yonge St
Toronto ON M4N 3N1
416-782-4447
Business Address: 4001 Leslie St
North York General Hospital
North York ON M2K 1E1
416-756-6529
Business Address: 4001 Leslie St
North York General Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
6North-Room 630
North York ON M2K 1E1
416-756-6000

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4001 Leslie St
North York General Hospital
North York ON M2K 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-756-6529
Fax: 416-756-6024
Address: 3080 Yonge St
Suite 5080
Toronto ON M4N 3N1
Phone: 416-782-4447
Fax: 416-782-1284

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Sinha Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jan 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Sinha (CPSO#: 118269 )
Business Address: 5080-3080 Yonge St
Toronto ON M4N 3N1
416-782-4447
Business Address: 4001 Leslie St
North York General Hospital
North York ON M2K 1E1
416-756-6529
Business Address: 4001 Leslie St
North York General Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
6North-Room 630
North York ON M2K 1E1
416-756-6000

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANAND SINHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINHA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANAND SINHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINHA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019