THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 05:13:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2019
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Postgraduate Medical Education
McMaster University
Room MDCL - 3101A
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-521-2100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 15 Wellesley Street West
Toronto Ontario M4Y 0G7
Phone: (416) 413-7999
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 18 Nov 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 18 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR.SAR RIZVI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Jan 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Rizvi (CPSO#: 118300 )
Business Address: 100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
905-848-7100

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Postgraduate Medical Education
McMaster University
Room MDCL - 3101A
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-521-2100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 15 Wellesley Street West
Toronto Ontario M4Y 0G7
Phone: (416) 413-7999
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 18 Nov 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 18 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR.SAR RIZVI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Jan 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Rizvi (CPSO#: 118300 )
Business Address: 100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
905-848-7100

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SYED ALI RAZA RIZVI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RIZVI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SYED ALI RAZA RIZVI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RIZVI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 2024
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 14 Dec 2023
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 20 Sep 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 16 Feb 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Nov 2024

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 14 Dec 2023

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 20 Sep 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Feb 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 16 Feb 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019