THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 06:19:43 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2019
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto Ontario M1E 4B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4162817476
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Civic Hospital
Pediatrics
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Phone: 9054942120
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
Phone: 9058952215
Fax: 9058305977

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Adolescent Medicine
Effective: 11 Sep 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Adolescent Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 11 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health System Toronto
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rasika Singh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Jan 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Singh (CPSO#: 118313 )
Business Address: 4168 Finch Avenue East
PH38
Toronto Ontario M1S 5H6
4163359001
Business Address: 20 Lynch Street
Brampton Ontario L6W 2Z8
9058632552
Business Address: 596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
9058952215
Business Address: 2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto Ontario M1E 4B9
4162817476

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto Ontario M1E 4B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4162817476
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Civic Hospital
Pediatrics
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Phone: 9054942120
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
Phone: 9058952215
Fax: 9058305977

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Adolescent Medicine
Effective: 11 Sep 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Adolescent Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 11 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health System Toronto
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rasika Singh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Jan 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Singh (CPSO#: 118313 )
Business Address: 4168 Finch Avenue East
PH38
Toronto Ontario M1S 5H6
4163359001
Business Address: 20 Lynch Street
Brampton Ontario L6W 2Z8
9058632552
Business Address: 596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
9058952215
Business Address: 2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto Ontario M1E 4B9
4162817476

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RASIKA SINGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RASIKA SINGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Oct 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019