THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 06:22:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2019
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1800 8th St E
Brightshores Health System
Department of Emergency Medicine
Owen Sound ON N4K 6M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-376-2121
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 90 7th Ave
Hanover District Hospital
Hanover ON N4N 1N1
Phone: 5193642340
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 02 Nov 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 02 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound Owen Sound
Hanover and District Hospital Hanover
HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound
LOCATION: Owen Sound

HOSPITAL: Hanover and District Hospital
LOCATION: Hanover

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ryan M. Labelle Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Oct 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Labelle (CPSO#: 118315 )
Business Address: 1800 8th St E
Owen Sound ON N4K 6M9

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1800 8th St E
Brightshores Health System
Department of Emergency Medicine
Owen Sound ON N4K 6M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-376-2121
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 90 7th Ave
Hanover District Hospital
Hanover ON N4N 1N1
Phone: 5193642340
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 02 Nov 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 02 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound Owen Sound
Hanover and District Hospital Hanover
HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound
LOCATION: Owen Sound

HOSPITAL: Hanover and District Hospital
LOCATION: Hanover

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ryan M. Labelle Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Oct 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Labelle (CPSO#: 118315 )
Business Address: 1800 8th St E
Owen Sound ON N4K 6M9

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RYAN MARK LABELLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LABELLE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RYAN MARK LABELLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LABELLE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019