THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:56:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2019
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 50 Charlton Ave E
St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Division of Nephrology
Marian Wing, 3rd Floor
Hamilton ON L8N 4A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-522-1155
Extension: 33787
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Credit Valley Hospital
Regional Nephrology Clinic
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Phone: 905-813-3951
Fax: 905-813-3830

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 17 Sep 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 24 Aug 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 17 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 24 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation
LOCATION: Hamilton

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 50 Charlton Ave E
St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Division of Nephrology
Marian Wing, 3rd Floor
Hamilton ON L8N 4A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-522-1155
Extension: 33787
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Credit Valley Hospital
Regional Nephrology Clinic
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Phone: 905-813-3951
Fax: 905-813-3830

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 17 Sep 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 24 Aug 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 17 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 24 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation
LOCATION: Hamilton

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CAMERON GILES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GILES is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CAMERON GILES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GILES is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019