THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:55:05 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2019
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 242 King St
Trenton Memorial Hospital
Emergency Medicine
Trenton ON K8V 3X1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 392-2540
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DAWSON MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Jul 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Dawson (CPSO#: 118399 )
Business Address: 242 King Street
Trenton Memorial Hospital
Trenton Ontario K8V 5S6
(613) 392-2540

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 242 King St
Trenton Memorial Hospital
Emergency Medicine
Trenton ON K8V 3X1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 392-2540
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DAWSON MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Jul 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Dawson (CPSO#: 118399 )
Business Address: 242 King Street
Trenton Memorial Hospital
Trenton Ontario K8V 5S6
(613) 392-2540

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREW BLAIR DAWSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAWSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREW BLAIR DAWSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAWSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jul 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019