THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:42:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2019
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: C-50 Mill St N
Newcastle ON L1B 1L4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9054461700
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MIKE MAI XUE MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Apr 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Xue (CPSO#: 118410 )
Business Address: C-50 Mill St N
Newcastle ON L1B 1L4

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: C-50 Mill St N
Newcastle ON L1B 1L4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9054461700
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MIKE MAI XUE MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Apr 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Xue (CPSO#: 118410 )
Business Address: C-50 Mill St N
Newcastle ON L1B 1L4

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MIKE MAI XUE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. XUE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MIKE MAI XUE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. XUE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019