THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 04:54:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2019
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2867 Ellesmere Road
Centenary Hospital
Toronto Ontario M1E 4B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 284-8131
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 4001 Leslie Street
North York General Hospital
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
University Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kalyani Sabanayagam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jun 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Sabanayagam (CPSO#: 118415 )
Business Address: 2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto Ontario M1E 4B9

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL
Medical School: McMaster University, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2867 Ellesmere Road
Centenary Hospital
Toronto Ontario M1E 4B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 284-8131
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 4001 Leslie Street
North York General Hospital
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
University Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kalyani Sabanayagam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jun 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Sabanayagam (CPSO#: 118415 )
Business Address: 2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto Ontario M1E 4B9

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KALYANI SABANAYAGAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SABANAYAGAM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KALYANI SABANAYAGAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SABANAYAGAM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019