THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/05/25 05:13:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 2001
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: McMaster University
Department of Cardiology
1280 Main St W
Hamilton ON L8S 4M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 525-9140
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 15 Dec 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 15 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Egypt

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. K.HOSSAMELDIN AHMED MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Sep 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Ahmed (CPSO#: 118424 )
Business Address: 1890 Rymal Road East
102
905-521-2100 Extn: 44598
Business Address: 22
Business Address: Hamilton general hospital
Hamilton General Hospital
Cardiology Division
(905) 525-9140

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: McMaster University
Department of Cardiology
1280 Main St W
Hamilton ON L8S 4M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 525-9140
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 15 Dec 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 15 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Egypt

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. K.HOSSAMELDIN AHMED MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Sep 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Ahmed (CPSO#: 118424 )
Business Address: 1890 Rymal Road East
102
905-521-2100 Extn: 44598
Business Address: 22
Business Address: Hamilton general hospital
Hamilton General Hospital
Cardiology Division
(905) 525-9140

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
15 Dec 2023
30 Jun 2026
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Dec 15 2023
EXPIRY DATE: Jun 30 2026
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. KHALED HOSSAMELDIN MOHAMED AHMED may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine, Division of Cardiology, McMaster University, in which Dr. AHMED holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. AHMED no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. AHMED’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. AHMED’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 15 December, 2023, and expires on 30 June, 2026. Upon renewal of Dr. AHMED's academic appointment at McMaster University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. KHALED HOSSAMELDIN MOHAMED AHMED may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine, Division of Cardiology, McMaster University, in which Dr. AHMED holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. AHMED no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. AHMED’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. AHMED’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 15 December, 2023, and expires on 30 June, 2026. Upon renewal of Dr. AHMED's academic appointment at McMaster University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 29 May 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Dec 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 15 Dec 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2026

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jul 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 May 2019