THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 02:35:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Leicester, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Mackenzie Richmond Hill Hospital
Intensive Care Unit
Richmond Hill Ontario
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 883-1212
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 18 Sep 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 18 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
William Osler Health System Toronto
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Leicester, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Mackenzie Richmond Hill Hospital
Intensive Care Unit
Richmond Hill Ontario
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 883-1212
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 18 Sep 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 18 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
William Osler Health System Toronto
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT JACKSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JACKSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT JACKSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JACKSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Leicester, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2023

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019